Howard et al v. Secuitas Security Services, USA Inc,

Plaintiff: Crystal Howard, Paul Galloway, Robert Newson and Alvan Young
Defendant: Secuitas Security Services, USA Inc,
Case Number: 1:2008cv02746
Filed: May 12, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2013 516 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/28/2013.Mailed notice.(jlj)
June 23, 2011 394 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 6/23/2011: Plaintiffs' Motion to Substitute Mr. William Cutler as Their Expert Because of the Illness of Their Prior Expert, Mr. Oran Clemons, and To Enlarge the Time for Expert Deposition s 387 is granted. Defendant has until July 22, 2011, to depose Plaintiffs' expert. Defendant may amend or supplement its Rule 26(a)(2) report by August 12, 2011. Plaintiffs then have until September 9, 2011, to depose Defendant's expert. Parties are ordered to schedule the deposition of both experts by July 1, 2011. Status hearing will be held on September 13, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 1944D. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (aac, )
April 19, 2011 378 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 4/19/2011. (aac, )
May 18, 2009 234 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 5/18/2009(vmj, )
January 20, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 1/20/2009.(vmj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard et al v. Secuitas Security Services, USA Inc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Howard
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Galloway
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Newson
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvan Young
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secuitas Security Services, USA Inc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?