General Insurance Company of America v. Clark Mall Corp et al

Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Clark Mall Corp, Marcos I. Tapia, Juan E. Bello, Jose L. Garcia, Leticia Hurtado, Young S Ko, Mariano Kon, Choong I Kuan, Rosa G. Madrigal, Hilda Mendoza, Man Ok No, Hee T. Park, Sung W. Park, Maria L. Roman and Victor H. Visoso
Case Number: 1:2008cv02787
Filed: May 14, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2012 258 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 1/27/2012. (gmr, )
December 13, 2011 253 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 12/13/2011. (gmr, )
April 5, 2011 218 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY entered by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole: Defendant/Counter-plaintiff Discount Megamall's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs in Underlying Action 200 is denied. For specific detail regarding the ruling, please click the document link for the order in its entirety. (gmr, )
September 20, 2010 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/20/2010. Mailed notice(cdh, )
September 16, 2010 186 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 9/16/2010. Mailed notice(cdh, )
July 26, 2010 166 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 7/26/2010. Mailed notice(cdh, )
March 30, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 3/30/2010:Mailed notice(tlp, )
March 10, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 3/10/2010. Mailed notice(cdh, )
March 9, 2010 137 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 3/9/2010: Mailed notice (jmp, )
April 16, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 4/16/2009. Mailed notice(cdh, )
April 6, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 4/6/2009. Mailed notice(cdh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Insurance Company of America v. Clark Mall Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Represented By: William K. McVisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Mall Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcos I. Tapia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan E. Bello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose L. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leticia Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young S Ko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariano Kon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choong I Kuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa G. Madrigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man Ok No
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hee T. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sung W. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria L. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor H. Visoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?