Great West Casualty Company v. Volvo Trucks North America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Defendant: Volvo Trucks North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv02872
Filed: May 16, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 4/10/2013:Mailed notice(mad, )
February 19, 2013 165 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 2/19/2013:Mailed notice(mad, )
October 20, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 10/20/2010:Mailed notice(mad, )
February 13, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 2/13/2009:Mailed notice(mad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great West Casualty Company v. Volvo Trucks North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Patrick J. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volvo Trucks North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?