Sommerfield v. City of Chicago et al

Plaintiff: Detlef Sommerfield
Defendant: City of Chicago and Knasiak
Case Number: 1:2008cv03025
Filed: May 23, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1983 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2017 543 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Knasiak for judgment Defendant Lawrence Knasiak's Combined Renewed Rule 50 Motion for Judgment As a Matter of Law, Rule 59(A) Motion for a New Trial and Rule 59(E) Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (Schumann, Anthony)
February 21, 2017 496 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/21/2017.Mailed notice(mjc, )
July 1, 2014 328 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 7/1/2014. Mailed notice (np, )
August 9, 2013 220 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 8/9/2013. Mailed notice(mgh, )
September 29, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/29/2011.Mailed notice(smm)
February 26, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/26/2009.(smm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sommerfield v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detlef Sommerfield
Represented By: Joseph A. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Meera Werth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knasiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?