Schneider v. County of Will et al

Plaintiff: B Michael Schneider
Defendant: County of Will, Paul J. Kaupas, Michael F. O'Leary and James E Garrison
Case Number: 1:2008cv03054
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Referring Judge: Michael T. Mason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2016 364 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendants' motion to dismiss this case for want of prosecution 330 , is granted, and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' remaining pending motions in limine 351 352 , are denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/25/2016:Mailed notice(srn, )
August 23, 2016 362 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that Mr. Schneider has failed to demonstrate actual bias under 28 U.S.C. § 144 sufficient to support the undersigned judge's recusal. For the same reasons, the Court also finds that no reasonable person would perceive an appearance of bias in these circumstances such that recusal is also not called for under 28 U.S.C. § 455. Therefore, Mr. Schneider's motion, R. 359 , is denied. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/23/2016:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 20, 2012 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/20/2012: Mailed notice (jmp, )
August 21, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 8/21/2009.(tsa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. County of Will et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B Michael Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Will
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Kaupas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?