Zang v. Alliance Financial Services of Illinois, LTD. et al

Plaintiff: John Zang
Defendant: Alliance Financial Services of Illinois, LTD. and Burton Stern
Case Number: 1:2008cv03370
Filed: June 11, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2012 191 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Michael T. Mason on 6/21/12.(rbf, )
September 27, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Michael T. Mason on 9/27/2010.(rbf, )
May 7, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Michael T. Mason on 5/7/2009.(rbf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zang v. Alliance Financial Services of Illinois, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Zang
Represented By: Karl W Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Financial Services of Illinois, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?