Tellabs Operations, Inc. v. Fujitsu Limited et al

Plaintiff: Tellabs Operation, Inc.
Defendant: Fujitsu Limited and Fujitsu Network Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv03379
Filed: June 11, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: James F. Holderman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2013 577 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. For the reasons set forth in the accompanying MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING PARTIES' RESPECTIVE REQUESTS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND DENYING FUJITSU LIMITED'S REQUEST FOR A NEW TRIAL REGARDING F UJITSU LIMITED'S '681 PATENT, "Fujitsu's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law that Tellabs Infringes Claims 6, 7, and 8 of U.S. Patent No. 7,228,681, Notwithstanding the Jury Verdict of Non-Infringement; or, Alternativel y Motion for a New Trial" (Case No. 09 C 4530, Dkt. No. 962 ) and "Tellabs, Inc.'s, Tellabs Operations, Inc.'s, and Tellabs North America, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law that U.S. Patent No. 7,227,681 Is Invalid" (Case No. 08 C 3379, Dkt. No. 566 ) are both denied in their entirety. Tellabs' original "Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law that U.S. Patent No. 7,227,681 Is Invalid" (Case No. 08 C 3379, Dkt. No. 557 ) and Tel labs' "Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Based on Fujitsu Limited's Failure to Prove Infringement of Claims 6-8" (Case No. 08 C 3379, Dkt. Nos. 547 , 552 , 555 (renewed)) are denied as moot. [For further details see attached order.] Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 1/24/2013:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 4, 2012 552 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Counter Defendants Tellabs North America, Inc., Tellabs Operation, Inc., Tellabs, Inc. for judgment as a Matter of Law Based on Fujitsu Limiteds Failure to Prove Infringement of Claims 6 8 [Docket No. 547], dated 8/30/2012, with SEALED designation removed (Bradley, James)
August 29, 2012 544 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/29/2012:Mailed notice(jms, )
July 27, 2012 524 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/27/2012: Tellabs, Inc.'s, Tellabs Operations, Inc.'s and Tellabs North America, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,227,681 444 is denied in light of disputed questions of material fact regarding the date when the invention disclosed by the '681 Patent was reduced to practice. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 7/27/2012: Mailed notice (am)
May 1, 2012 504 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 5/1/2012:Mailed notice(jms, )
March 21, 2012 479 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 3/21/2012: Mailed notice (am)
September 29, 2011 427 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 9/29/2011: Mailed notice (am)
March 31, 2011 369 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 3/31/2011:Judicial staff mailed notice(gl, )
May 13, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER PRELIMINARY CONSTRUING CERTAIN DISPUTED CLAIM TERMS BASED ON THE INTRINSIC EVIDENCE. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 5/13/2009: Mailed notice (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tellabs Operations, Inc. v. Fujitsu Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tellabs Operation, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Pritikin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu Network Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?