National Rifle Association of America, Inc. et al v. The City of Chicago et al Featured Case

Plaintiff National Rifle Association of America, Inc., et al. alleged that Defendants The City of Chicago and Richard M. Daley infringed on their right to keep and bear arms as guaranteed by the Second and Fourteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution.

Plaintiff: National Rifle Association of America, Inc., Kathryn Tyler, Anthony Burton, Van F Welton and Brett Benson
Defendant: The City of Chicago and Richard M. Daley
Case Number: 1:2008cv03697
Filed: June 27, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2012 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/28/2012:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 25, 2012 134 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/25/2012:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 7, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court Supplement to MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 1/7/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 22, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 12/22/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
December 4, 2008 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 12/4/2008:Mailed notice(srn, )
June 27, 2008 1
COMPLAINT filed by National Rifle Association of America, Inc., Kathryn Tyler, Anthony Burton, Van F Welton, Brett Benson. (jmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Rifle Association of America, Inc. et al v. The City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Rifle Association of America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen A. Kolodziej
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Tyler
Represented By: Stephen A. Kolodziej
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Burton
Represented By: Stephen A. Kolodziej
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van F Welton
Represented By: Stephen A. Kolodziej
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Benson
Represented By: Stephen A. Kolodziej
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?