Native American Arts, Inc. v. Peter Stone Co., U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Native American Arts, Inc.
Defendant: Peter Stone Co., U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv03908
Filed: July 9, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 25:640 Indian Tribal Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 373 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 12/2/2016:Mailed notice(jms, )
June 9, 2015 323 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/9/2015:Mailed notice(jms, )
January 14, 2015 312 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 1/14/2015:Mailed notice(jms, )
April 30, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 4/30/2009.(kj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Native American Arts, Inc. v. Peter Stone Co., U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native American Arts, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Patrick Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Stone Co., U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?