Stollings v. Ryobi Technologies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brandon Stollings
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc. and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv04006
Filed: July 15, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Norgle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2015 601 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/6/2015.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
July 22, 2013 400 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/22/2013.Mailed notice.(jlj)
October 10, 2012 369 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/10/2012.Mailed notice.(jlj)
August 2, 2012 330 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc. for judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50 (Bell, John)
January 21, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/21/2011.Mailed notice.(jlj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stollings v. Ryobi Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Stollings
Represented By: Michael M Cushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?