United States of America v. Clark et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James W. Clark and Leroy E. Drury
Case Number: 1:2008cv04158
Filed: July 22, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 8/19/2010. (ph, )
February 3, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/3/2010. (aac, )
September 2, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/2/2009. (aac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan C. Haile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy E. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?