Limitnone LLC v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff LimitNone, LLC alleged that Defendant Google Inc. violated the Illinois Trade Secrets Act and Illinois Consumer Fraud & Deceptive Business Practices Act. Plaintiff charged that Defendant improperly accessed and copied Plaintiff\'s gMove email migration software and then created and released a competing software product called Google Email Uploader.

Plaintiff: Limitnone LLC
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv04178
Filed: July 23, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2009 61 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of record transferred to United States District Court Northern District of California received date 1/29/2009; USDC Northern District of California case no. 09-cv-412. (aac, )
February 2, 2009 60 RETURN of U.S. Post Office receipt, article no. 7006 0100 0001 7312 6899. (aac, )
January 30, 2009 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgment by the USDC, Northern District of California, of Transferred case record opened as case number 5:09cv00412, filed on 1/29/09. (lcw, )
January 27, 2009 59 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California the electronic record via CM/ECF. Mailed paper document no. 29 via certified mail, article no. 7006 0100 0001 7312 6899. (aac, )
January 26, 2009 58 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: In light of the Seventh Circuit's order denying the petition for a writ of mandamus, the stay of the court's transfer order is hereby lifted. The clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Mailed notice (aac, )
October 7, 2008 57 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt from USCA; USCA Case No. 08-3499. (aac, )
October 3, 2008 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: LimitNone's motion for a stay of the Court's transfer order pending resolution of its mandamus petition 50 is granted. The Clerk shall retain the record in this case until the Court orders otherwise. Google's motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead 52 is also granted. If this case proceeds in this district, the Court will set a date for Google to file its responsive pleading. If the case proceeds in California, Google shall file its responsive pleading twenty days after the transfer-in order is entered on the docket unless the California Court orders otherwise. The Clerk is further directed to forward a copy of this order to the Seventh Circuit. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
October 3, 2008 55 RESPONSE by Google Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Limitnone LLC to stay transfer pending appeal filed on emergency basis 50 (Herrick, Rachel)
October 2, 2008 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Google shall file a response to LimitNone's renewed motion for a stay [#50] by Friday, October 3, at 1:00 p.m. The court expects to rule on LimitNone's motion to stay shortly after it has had an opportunity to consider Google's response. The clerk is directed to forward a copy of this order to the Seventh Circuit.Mailed notice (rth, )
October 2, 2008 53 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel Herrick for presentment of extension of time 52 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/7/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Herrick, Rachel)
October 2, 2008 52 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. for extension of time to File Responsive Pleading (Herrick, Rachel)
October 2, 2008 51 NOTICE by Limitnone LLC re MOTION by Plaintiff Limitnone LLC to stay transfer pending appeal filed on emergency basis 50 of Filing Exhibit A to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Stephen)
October 2, 2008 50 MOTION by Plaintiff Limitnone LLC to stay transfer pending appeal filed on emergency basis (Wood, Stephen)
October 1, 2008 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: On September 22, 2008, this court entered an order transferring this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.4, the clerk may not transfer this case prior to October 6, 2008. On September 26, 2008, Limitnone filed a motion seeking to stay the September 22d transfer order. In its motion, Limitnone asserts that it intends to file a petition for a writ of mandamus and argues that a stay is necessary to give the Seventh Circuit an opportunity to consider the merits of its promised petition before the case is transferred. Limitnone noticed its motion to stay for October 1, 2008, and Google's out-of-town counsel contacted the court's clerk today to determine if an appearance is necessary tomorrow. It appears that Limitnone has not yet filed the promised petition for a writ of mandamus with the appellate court, despite the fact that this court issued its transfer order nine days ago on September 22d. Accordingly, Limitnone's motion to stay 46 is denied without prejudice.Mailed notice (rth, )
September 30, 2008 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Limitnone LLC by Stephen Arthur Wood (Wood, Stephen)
September 26, 2008 47 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Charles Luzadder for presentment of motion to stay 46 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 10/2/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Luzadder, Matthew)
September 26, 2008 46 MOTION by Plaintiff Limitnone LLC to stay Transfer Pending Appeal (Luzadder, Matthew)
September 22, 2008 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: LimitNone's motion for reconsideration 30 is denied. Google's motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer venue 17 is granted in part. The clerk is directed to transfer this case to the federal district court for the Northern District of California in accordance with Local Rule 83.4, and to terminate the case from this court's docket. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (aac, )
September 11, 2008 44 NOTICE of Correction regarding 43 . (aac, )
September 10, 2008 43 DOCUMENT entered in error. (Baskerville, Henry) Modified on 9/11/2008 (aac, ).
September 5, 2008 42 NOTICE by Google Inc. re notice of removal 1 (Exhibit A) (Baskerville, Henry)
September 2, 2008 41 REPLY by Defendant Google Inc. to motion to dismiss 17 (in Support of) (Herrick, Rachel)
September 2, 2008 40 NOTICE by Limitnone LLC (Luzadder, Matthew)
September 2, 2008 39 REPLY by Plaintiff Limitnone LLC to motion for reconsideration,, motion for relief,,,,,,, 30 (Luzadder, Matthew)
August 26, 2008 38 RESPONSE by Google Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Limitnone LLC for reconsideration regarding order on motion for leave to file,,,, order on motion for miscellaneous relief,,,, order on motion to stay,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,, 27 MOTION by Plaintiff Limitnone LLC for reconsideration regarding order on motion for leave to file,,,, order on motion for miscellaneous relief,,,, order on motion to stay,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,, 27 30 (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
August 19, 2008 37 NOTICE by Limitnone LLC re response to motion 36 (Plater, Caroline)
August 19, 2008 36 RESPONSE by Limitnone LLC to MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. to dismiss 17 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Plater, Caroline)
August 18, 2008 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file brief in excess of 15 pages 31 is granted in excess of five pages. Plaintiff's Motion for reconsideration of 8/4/2008 minute order(docket no. 27) 30 is entered. Defendant to respond to the motion for reconsideration by 8/26/2008. Plaintiff to reply by 9/2/2008. The Court will rule expeditiously. Ruling will be by mail unless otherwise notified. No appearance is necessary on 8/19/2009. Mailed and telephoned notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
August 13, 2008 34 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Charles Luzadder for presentment of motion for reconsideration,, motion for relief,,,,,,, 30 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/19/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Luzadder, Matthew)
August 13, 2008 33 NOTICE of Motion by Caroline Claire Plater for presentment of motion for leave to file 31 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/19/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Plater, Caroline)
August 13, 2008 32 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Charles Luzadder for presentment of motion for reconsideration,, motion for relief,,,,,,, 30 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/19/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Luzadder, Matthew)
August 13, 2008 31 MOTION by Plaintiff Limitnone LLC for leave to file Brief in Excess of 15 Pages (Plater, Caroline)
August 13, 2008 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Limitnone LLC for reconsideration regarding order on motion for leave to file,,,, order on motion for miscellaneous relief,,,, order on motion to stay,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,, 27 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Luzadder, Matthew)
August 4, 2008 29 EXHIBIT B to Defendant Google Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to dismiss 18 for Improper Venue Under F.R.C.P 12(b)(3) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (RESTRICTED)(kj, )
August 4, 2008 28 NOTICE by Google Inc. re memorandum in support of motion 18 of filing EXHIBIT B TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (FILED UNDER SEAL) (Baskerville, Henry)
August 4, 2008 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning: The court will consider Google's motion to dismiss 17 before Limitnone's motion to remand. Accordingly, briefing shall proceed as follows on the motion to dismiss: Limitnone's response is due August 19, 2008, and Google's reply is due September 2, 2008. The court will rule by mail. Limitnone's motion for leave to file a motion to remand 12 is denied without prejudice. It is premature, since Limitnone has not fully complied with the court's standing order, and in any event, the court declines to consider Limitnone's arguments about preemption unless and until it determines that venue is proper in Illinois. Limitnone may renew its motion if the court finds that venue is proper in Illinois. Google's motions to stay discovery 23 and for leave to file a document under seal 20 are granted. Mailed notice (rth, )
August 1, 2008 26 SUPPLEMENT to motion for leave to file 12 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Plater, Caroline)
July 30, 2008 25 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel Herrick for presentment of motion to stay 23 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/5/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Herrick, Rachel)
July 30, 2008 24 MEMORANDUM by Google Inc. in support of motion to stay 23 (Herrick, Rachel)
July 30, 2008 23 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. to stay Discovery (Herrick, Rachel)
July 30, 2008 22 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel Herrick for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 20 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/5/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Herrick, Rachel)
July 30, 2008 21 MEMORANDUM by Google Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 20 (Herrick, Rachel)
July 30, 2008 20 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc.FOR RESTRICTING ORDER PURSUANT TO L.R. 26.2, AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL AN UNREDACTED COPY OF EXHIBIT B TO ITS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO L.R. 5.8 (Herrick, Rachel)
July 30, 2008 19 NOTICE of Motion by Rachel Herrick for presentment of motion to dismiss 17 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/5/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Herrick, Rachel)
July 30, 2008 18 MEMORANDUM by Google Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 17 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Herrick, Rachel)
July 30, 2008 17 MOTION by Defendant Google Inc. to dismiss (Herrick, Rachel)
July 29, 2008 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Michael Thomas Zeller (Zeller, Michael)
July 29, 2008 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Blanche M. Manning:Application for Rachel M. Herrick to appear pro hac vice 8 is granted. (rth, )
July 29, 2008 14 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Limitnone LLC (Plater, Caroline)
July 29, 2008 13 NOTICE of Motion by Caroline Claire Plater for presentment of motion for leave to file 12 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/5/2008 at 11:00 AM. (Plater, Caroline)
July 29, 2008 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Limitnone LLC for leave to file Motion to Remand (Plater, Caroline)
July 29, 2008 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Limitnone LLC by David A. Rammelt (Rammelt, David)
July 29, 2008 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Limitnone LLC by Caroline Claire Plater (Plater, Caroline)
July 29, 2008 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Limitnone LLC by Matthew Charles Luzadder (Luzadder, Matthew)
July 29, 2008 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 07520000000002974005. (Herrick, Rachel)
July 28, 2008 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel M. Herrick (Herrick, Rachel)
July 28, 2008 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google Inc. by Henry M. Baskerville (Baskerville, Henry)
July 28, 2008 5 corporate disclosure STATEMENT by Google Inc. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
July 24, 2008 4 Notification as to Affiliates by Google Inc. (Cyrluk, Jonathan)
July 24, 2008 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter with attorney appearance form to Counsel of Record Kelley Drye & Warren LLP. (ca, )
July 23, 2008 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ca, )
July 23, 2008 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2008 L 006828) filed by Google Inc. Filing fee $ 350. (ca, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Limitnone LLC v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limitnone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Cyrluk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?