Newman v. Hulick et al

Petitioner: Melvin Newman
Respondent: Don Hulick
Case Number: 1:2008cv04240
Filed: July 25, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/25/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, )
March 6, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/6/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, )
November 8, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/8/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
January 31, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/31/2011: For the reasons stated below, the contested portions of Petitioners motion 50 for additional discovery and to add to his witness list are respectfully denied. Mailed by Judge's Staff notice(tbk, )
December 3, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/3/2010: Before the Court are the portions of Petitioner's motion 38 that remain in dispute, namely Petitioner's requests (a) to take the depositions of Dr. Schwartz, Dr. Gutm ann, and Dr. Smith, (b) to issue subpoenas duces tecum to those three individuals and to attorney Johnson, and (c) to add five individuals to Petitioner's witness list. Petitioner's remaining requests ((a), (b), and (c) above) are denied wi thout prejudice. However, the Court grants Petitioner leave to reopen the deposition of and to issue a subpoena duces tecum to Michael Johnson, for the purposes discussed below. For further details, please see below. [ For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice(hp, )
November 29, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/29/2010: Before the Court is Petitioners request for an order requiring that Respondents mental examination of Petitioner be videotaped. Upon careful consideration of Petitioners motion 38 , Respondents response 45 , and the arguments of counsel at todays hearing, the Court respectfully denies Petitioners request. The Court will issue a written ruling on the remaining disputed discovery issues in due course. Finally, as stated on the record in open court, Respondents unopposed request to subpoena Petitioners full medical records from Petitioners stays at Hartgrove Hospital [see 45, at 14] is granted. Mailed notice (For further details see written opinion) (nf, )
November 2, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court For the reasons stated below, Respondents request for discovery 35 is granted in part and denied in part. WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/2/2010. (For further detail see written opinion).Mailed notice(smm)
September 21, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 9/21/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Hulick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melvin Newman
Represented By: Steven Andrew Drizin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Don Hulick
Represented By: Erica R. Seyburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?