Anthony Marano Company v. MS-Grand Bridgeview, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Marano Company
Defendant: MS-Grand Bridgeview, Inc., Peter Limperis and Makis Limperis
Case Number: 1:2008cv04244
Filed: July 25, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Agriculture Acts Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James B. Zagel
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2011 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed on 7/6/2011.Mailed notice(drw, )
December 23, 2010 294 Opinion or Order of the Court Enter MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Mailed notice(drw, )
December 17, 2009 230 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed on 12/17/2009.Mailed notice(drw, )
July 1, 2009 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Contempt Order. Signed 7/1/2009.Mailed notice(drw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Marano Company v. MS-Grand Bridgeview, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Marano Company
Represented By: Michael Thomas Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS-Grand Bridgeview, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Limperis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makis Limperis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?