Broaddus v. Shields

Plaintiff: Bret A. Broaddus
Defendant: Kevin Shields
Case Number: 1:2008cv04420
Filed: August 6, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Personal Prop.: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2012 369 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/5/2012: The Court's April 4, 2012 Memorandum Opinion and Order 367 has been corrected to reflect the correct date of the Court's January 3, 2012 Stipulation and Order 327 .Mailed notice(kef, )
April 4, 2012 367 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/4/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 5, 2012 329 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/5/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
November 12, 2010 245 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/12/2010:Mailed notice(kef, )
September 1, 2010 205 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 9/1/2010:Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broaddus v. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret A. Broaddus
Represented By: Ariel Weissberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Shields
Represented By: Thomas Ivan Matyas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?