Jones Day v. BlockShopper.com et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Jones Day alleged that Defendants BlockShopper.com, Brian Timpone and Edward Weinhaus used Jones Day marks, links to the Jones Day web site and used proprietary information from the Jones Day web site to create the false impression that Jones Day is affiliated and/or approved, sponsored or endorsed the business conducted by the Defendants.

Plaintiff: Jones Day
Defendant: BlockShopper.com, Brian Timpone and Edward Weinhaus
Case Number: 1:2008cv04572
Filed: August 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Trademark Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2009 Filing 65
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah:Parties having filed a stipulation of dismissal, this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs. Civil case terminated. Bench trial set for 3/30/09 is vacated. Mailed notice(maf)
February 13, 2009 Filing 64
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Fiorentinos, Irene)
December 4, 2008 Filing 62
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BlockShopper, LLC Rule 3.2 Disclosure Statement (Spears, Natalie)
December 3, 2008 Filing 59
Defendant Blockshopper LLC's ANSWER to amended complaint and Jury Demand by BlockShopper, LLC(Spears, Natalie)
December 1, 2008 Filing 58
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Defendants' motion for leave to file additional appearances 56 is granted. Mailed notices (gcy, )
November 26, 2008 Filing 57
NOTICE of Motion by Natalie J. Spears for presentment of motion for leave to file 56 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 12/4/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Spears, Natalie)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 11/13/2008:(gcy, )
October 23, 2008 Filing 53
OBJECTIONS by Jones Day to reply, 51 opposing Defendants' FRE 201 request to take judicial notice (Schroeder, Paul)
October 20, 2008 Filing 52
ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Parties Public Citizen, The Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge by Paul Alan Levy and Citizen Media Law Project (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Levy, Paul)
October 10, 2008 Filing 51
REPLY by Defendants Brian Timpone, Edward Weinhaus, BlockShopper, LLC to motion to dismiss 43 [in support thereof] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A, part 1, # 2 Exhibit Group Exhibit A, part 2, # 3 Exhibit Group Exhibit A, part 3, # 4 Notice of Filing)(Carroll, Martin)
October 3, 2008 Filing 50
RESPONSE by Jones Dayin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Brian Timpone, Edward Weinhaus, BlockShopper, LLC to dismiss Amended Complaint 43 (Schroeder, Paul)
September 26, 2008 Filing 49
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Motion by attorney Paul Alan Levy for leave to appear pro hac vice for defendants Public Citizen, The Electronic Frontier Foundation. Public Knowledge and Citizens Media Law Project is granted. Mailed notices (gcy, ) Modified on 10/14/2008 (gcy, ).
September 25, 2008 Filing 48
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09/03/08 before the Honorable John W. Darrah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Mary M. Hacker, (312) 435-5564, Mary_Hacker@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings.

Redaction Request due 10/16/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2008. (Hacker, Mary)
September 24, 2008 Filing 46
REPLY by Unknown Unknown Party to motion for leave to file,, 38 -- REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICI CURIAE (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Libman, Robert)
September 23, 2008 Filing 45
RESPONSE by Jones Dayin Opposition to MOTION by Unknown Unknown Party for leave to file -- MOTION OF ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, PUBLIC CITIZEN, PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, AND CITIZEN MEDIA LAW PROJECT FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICI CURIAE SUPPORTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAIN 38 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Schroeder, Paul)
September 22, 2008 Filing 44
NOTICE by all defendants re MOTION by Defendants Brian Timpone, Edward Weinhaus, BlockShopper, LLC to dismiss Amended Complaint 43 (Hachikian, Adam)
September 19, 2008 Filing 40
MOTION by Defendants Brian Timpone, Edward Weinhaus, BlockShopper, LLC to dismiss Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A, # 2 Notice of Filing)(Carroll, Martin)
September 18, 2008 Filing 42
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 9/18/2008:(gcy, )
September 15, 2008 Filing 35
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Brian Timpone, Edward Weinhaus, BlockShopper, LLC by Tracy Katz Muhl (Muhl, Tracy)
September 12, 2008 Filing 34
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Defendant Blockshopper's Motion for leave to file excess pages [32,33] is granted. Mailed notices (gcy, )
September 10, 2008 Filing 33
NOTICE of Motion by Adam A Hachikian for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 32 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 9/18/2008 at 09:00 AM. (Hachikian, Adam)
September 4, 2008 Filing 29
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Brian Timpone, Edward Weinhaus by Daniel S. Hefter and Defendant BlockShopper, LLC (Hefter, Daniel)
September 3, 2008 Filing 28
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant BlockShopper.com. (gcy, )
September 2, 2008 Filing 25
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jones Day by Brent P. Ray (Ray, Brent)
August 28, 2008 Filing 24
CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Jones Day regarding amended complaint 23 (Fiorentinos, Irene)
August 26, 2008 Filing 22
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah:Settlement conference held on 8/26/08. Status hearing set for 9/3/08 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf, )
August 22, 2008 Filing 21
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jones Day by Irene Savanis Fiorentinos (Fiorentinos, Irene)
August 19, 2008 Filing 20
STIPULATION and ORDER Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/19/2008:(gcy, )
August 18, 2008 Filing 16
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Brian Timpone, Edward Weinhaus by Adam A Hachikian (Hachikian, Adam)
August 15, 2008 Filing 14
NOTICE of Motion by Paul W. Schroeder for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order 4 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/19/2008 at 09:45 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, # 3 Exhibits A-F to Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, # 4 Supplemental Declaration of Kristy Posch in support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(Schroeder, Paul)
August 14, 2008 Filing 13
REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $350.00, receipt no. 3014350, for duplicate payment (Schroeder, Paul)
August 13, 2008 Filing 9
DECLARATION of Kristy Posch (Supplemental) in support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schroeder, Paul)
August 12, 2008 Filing 7
SUMMONSES Issued, three originals, as to Defendants BlockShopper.com, Brian Timpone, Edward Weinhaus. (ar, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 889
June 18, 2019 Filing 888
June 18, 2019 Filing 887
June 18, 2019 Filing 877
June 18, 2019 Filing 854
June 18, 2019 Filing 811
June 18, 2019 Filing 804
June 18, 2019 Filing 800
June 18, 2019 Filing 798
June 18, 2019 Filing 795
June 18, 2019 Filing 793
June 18, 2019 Filing 790
June 18, 2019 Filing 784
June 18, 2019 Filing 783
June 18, 2019 Filing 776
June 18, 2019 Filing 774
June 18, 2019 Filing 751
June 18, 2019 Filing 748
June 18, 2019 Filing 702
June 18, 2019 Filing 701
June 18, 2019 Filing 647

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones Day v. BlockShopper.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jones Day
Represented By: Paul W. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlockShopper.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Timpone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Weinhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?