In Re: Aftermarket Filters Antitrust Litigation

In Re: Aftermarket Filters Antitrust Litigation
Case Number: 1:2008cv04883
Filed: August 18, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Referring Judge: Geraldine Soat Brown
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Gettleman
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2012 866 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/20/2012: Mailed notice (gds, )
February 14, 2011 733 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 2/14/2011: This order sets out the parties' agreements as described in their Joint Status Report 711 and the court's rulings on the parties' discovery disputes as descr ibed in the Joint Motion For Resolution Of Discovery Disputes 708 . For the reasons stated on the record during the hearing on February 7, 2011: (a) the Joint Motion is granted, and the disputes are ruled upon as stated herein; and (b) Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct the Depositions of Four Champion Laboratories, Inc. Employees 706 is granted. [For further details sett minute order.] Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 18, 2010 679 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 11/18/2010: Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 4, 2010 667 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 11/4/2010:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
October 1, 2010 611 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: For the reasons set out below, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Preclude Discovery from Absent Class Members and to Stay Defendants' Subpoenas Pending Resolution of this Motion 511 is denied. [For further details see text below.]Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 14, 2010 568 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/14/2010: Mailed notice (gds, )
April 1, 2010 426 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/1/2010. (gmr, )
November 5, 2009 304 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/5/2009. (gmr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Aftermarket Filters Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Aftermarket Filters Antitrust Litigation
Represented By: Margaret M. Zwisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?