Gittings v. Tredegar Film Products et al

Plaintiff: Dale C Gittings
Defendant: Tredegar Film Products and Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 1:2008cv04972
Filed: September 2, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Tredegar Corporation Employee Benefit Plan for judgment (Mathisen, Eric)
November 29, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 11/29/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
May 20, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 5/20/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 16, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/16/2010:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 12, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Tredegar Corporation Employee Benefit Plan for judgment on the Administrative Record (Mathisen, Eric)
November 10, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 11/10/2008:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gittings v. Tredegar Film Products et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale C Gittings
Represented By: Joseph E Urani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tredegar Film Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?