More v. City of Braidwood et al

Plaintiff: James More
Defendant: City of Braidwood, Douglas Savarino, Allen Soucie and Unknown Braidwood Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2008cv05203
Filed: September 11, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Will
Referring Judge: Arlander Keys
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2010 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants City of Braidwood, Douglas Savarino, Allen Soucie for judgment as a Matter of Law at the Conclusion of the Plaintiff's Case (Kurnik, William)
September 21, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court Plaintiff's motion to compel 79 is denied. WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/21/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )
September 7, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court For the reasons stated below, the parties' motions in limine [65-1, 67-1] are granted in part and denied in part.; WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 9/7/2010:Mailed notice(rth, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: More v. City of Braidwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James More
Represented By: Aaron Benjamin Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Braidwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Savarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Soucie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Braidwood Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?