Burke v. 401 N. Wabash Venture, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Michael Burke
Defendant: 401 N. Wabash Venture, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2008cv05330
Filed: September 18, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: George M. Marovich
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable George M. Marovich on 6/28/2011. Mailed notice(nf, )
June 9, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable George M. Marovich on 6/9/2010. (kjd, )
July 28, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable George M. Marovich on 7/28/2009.(vcf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. 401 N. Wabash Venture, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Burke
Represented By: Thomas F Courtney, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 401 N. Wabash Venture, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?