Edgewater Beach Apartments Corporation v. Frontier Insurance Company in Rehabilitation

Plaintiff: Edgewater Beach Apartments Corporation
Defendant: Frontier Insurance Company in Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2008cv05375
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Insurance Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan B. Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 7/20/2010: Opinion. Defendants' motion to dismiss 71 is granted in part and denied in remaining part. Mailed notice(vcf, )
February 18, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/18/2010.Mailed notice(vcf, )
March 19, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/19/2009.(vcf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgewater Beach Apartments Corporation v. Frontier Insurance Company in Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgewater Beach Apartments Corporation
Represented By: Mary Cannon Veed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Insurance Company in Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?