Motorola, Inc. v. Lemko Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Motorola, Inc.
Defendant: Lemko Corporation, Shaowei Pan, Hanjuan Jin, Xiaohua Wu, Xuefeng Bai and Xiaohong Sheng
Case Number: 1:2008cv05427
Filed: September 23, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2012 912 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/10/2012. (mk)
May 24, 2011 738 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/24/2011. For the reasons stated below, the Court grants Motorola and Huawei's joint motion to dismiss Huawei with prejudice [docket no. 725]. [For further details see written opinion.] Mailed notice (lw, ).
November 30, 2010 662 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/30/2010. The Court grants defendant Huawei's motion to amend the protective order 654 with the modifications stated below. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (ca, ).
November 17, 2010 649 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion: For the reasons stated below, the Court grants in part and denies in part Motorola's motion to compel Huawei to respond to Motorola's document requests 634 and Huawei's motion to compel Motorola to produce documents 631 , and denies Motorola's motion to compel Lemko to produce source code pursuant to requests 90-99 623 . (For further details see Written Opinion.) Mailed notice. (psm, )
November 15, 2010 647 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion: For the reasons stated below, the Court denies the motion by certain defendants to dismiss counts 1 and 15 of plaintiffs third amended complaint docket no. 499 . (For further detail see Written Opinion.) Mailed notice. (psm, )
June 1, 2010 435 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/1/2010. (tc, )
April 12, 2010 403 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/12/2010. (tc, )
March 15, 2010 385 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 3/15/2010. (tc, )
February 11, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/11/2009. (td, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motorola, Inc. v. Lemko Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motorola, Inc.
Represented By: R. Mark Halligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lemko Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaowei Pan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanjuan Jin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiaohua Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xuefeng Bai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiaohong Sheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?