Leonel & Noel Corp. v. Cerveceria Centro Americana, S.A. et al

Plaintiff: Leonel & Noel Corp.
Defendant: Cerveceria Centro Americana, S.A., Central Beer Import & Export, Inc., GK Skaggs, Inc. and Gregory Skaggs
Case Number: 1:2008cv05556
Filed: September 29, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2012 275 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/30/12. (mk)
August 15, 2011 228 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant GK Skaggs, Inc. for judgment AS A MATTER OF LAW ON COUNT II (Waldon, Dennis)
December 20, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/20/2010: Mailed notice(hp, )
April 13, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/13/2009: Mailed notice(hp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonel & Noel Corp. v. Cerveceria Centro Americana, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel & Noel Corp.
Represented By: George J. Spathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerveceria Centro Americana, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Beer Import & Export, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GK Skaggs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?