United States of America v. Palivos

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Peter Palivos
Case Number: 1:2008cv05589
Filed: September 30, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2255 Remedies on motion attacking sentence

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/15/2011: The motion of Peter Palivos for a certificate of appealability 83 is denied. See Statement portion of this minute order for more information. Mailed notice. [For further details see written opinion.] (ea, )
October 4, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 10/4/2011:Mailed notice(mad, )
September 15, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 9/15/2011:Mailed notice(mad, )
August 12, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Decision and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 8/12/2010:Mailed notice(mad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Palivos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Palivos
Represented By: Tara Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?