Bell v. Jones

Plaintiff: Timothy Bell
Defendant: Eddie Jones
Case Number: 1:2008cv05622
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus Office
County: Livingston
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 2/6/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
January 14, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 1/14/2009:Mailed notice(srn, )
October 28, 2008 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/28/2008:Mailed notice(srn, )
October 7, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/7/2008:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?