Pantaleo vs. Hayes

Plaintiff: Dean Pantaleo
Defendant: Louis Hayes, Jr., Anthony Maraviglia, Village of Hinsdale, Robert Groner, Security Guard Sanchez, Nurse Pitts, Dr. Martinez and Adventist Hinsdale Hospital
Case Number: 1:2008cv06419
Filed: November 7, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 292 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 9/20/2013: Defendants' motions for summary judgment [#218, 221, 224, 227] are granted in part and denied in part. Summary judgment is granted in favor of Hayes, Maraviglia, and the Vil lage on Counts I and III, in favor of the Village on Count II, and in favor of all defendants on Count V. Summary judgment is also granted in favor of all defendants on Counts II and IV with respect to application of the four-point restraints. This case will be called for a status hearing on October 15, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are directed to engage in a sincere effort to settle this case and to report their progress at the status hearing.Mailed notice(mad, )
September 17, 2013 291 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 9/17/2013: Defendants' motions to bar the testimony of Laurie Zoloth, Ph.D. [#229, 276, 280] are granted. Mailed notice(mad, )
June 23, 2011 179 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 6/24/2011: The Court Denies the Defendants' motions to strike (docs. # 162 , 165 , 166 ). The Court denies as moot the Plaintiff's motions to supplement (docs.# 169 , 171 ). Mailed notice (tlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pantaleo vs. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Hayes, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Lee Scarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Maraviglia
Represented By: Laura Lee Scarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Hinsdale
Represented By: Laura Lee Scarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Groner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Guard Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Hinsdale Hospital
Represented By: Steven Charles Steinback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Pantaleo
Represented By: Jessica Rae Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?