Donado v. Pontiac Correctional Center et al

Petitioner: Saul Donado
Respondent: Pontiac Correctional Center and Attorney General of the State of Illinois
Case Number: 1:2008cv06812
Filed: November 26, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/5/2011: For the reasons set forth below, Petitioner's motion to file late notice of appeal 41 is respectfully denied and Petitioner's motion for leave to appeal in forma pau peris 43 is denied as moot. In addition, pursuant to Rule 2(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts and Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d)(1), Stateville Warden Marcus Hardy should be substituted in place of Pontiac Warden Guy Pierce as the Respondent in this case. Mailed notice(mjc, )
August 17, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/17/2011: Petitioner Saul Donado's motion to file late notice of appeal, request certificate of appeal, request to initiate appeal, and request for docketing statement 41 is taken under advisement. Briefing on the motion is ordered as follows: counsel for Petitioner (Ms. Najera) and counsel for Respondent are directed to file written submissions no later than 9/1/2011 addressing any pertinent factual or legal matters relating to the motion, as well as any argument on the separate issue of whether a certificate of appealability should be issued in this case. Petitioner may file by 9/1/2011 a supplemental memorandum if he wishes to present any additional information in sup port of his motion. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this order to all counsel of record and to Petitioner at the Stateville address listed on the docket sheet, which the Court presumes is Petitioner's current address. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(mjc, )
February 1, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/1/2011. Mailed by Judge's Staff notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donado v. Pontiac Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saul Donado
Represented By: Maria G. Najera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pontiac Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?