Diaz et al v. Kraft Foods Global, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jose Diaz, Bessy Flores, Ramon Pena, Alberto Robles and Robert Vela
Defendant: Kraft Foods Global, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv06814
Filed: November 26, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 275 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/5/2013. Mailed notice (cjg, )
March 1, 2013 253 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Kraft Foods Global, Inc. for judgment as a matter of law (Phanthavong, Christy)
February 19, 2013 233 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 2/19/2013. Mailed notice (cjg, )
May 27, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 5/27/2010. Mailed notice (cjg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz et al v. Kraft Foods Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Diaz
Represented By: Michael S. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessy Flores
Represented By: Michael S. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Pena
Represented By: Michael S. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Robles
Represented By: Michael S. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Vela
Represented By: Michael S. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Foods Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?