Loudermilk v. Best Pallet Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Kevin Loudermilk
Defendant: Best Pallet Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2008cv06869
Filed: December 2, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Referring Judge: P. Michael Mahoney
Presiding Judge: Philip G. Reinhard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 8/13/2010: For the reasons stated below, the court denies the motion 123 for attorney fees and costs under 28 U.S.C § 1927.[For further details see minute order.] Electronic Notices.(jat, )
November 25, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 11/25/2009:(pg, )
October 8, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable P. Michael Mahoney on 10/8/2009. (jmm-r, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loudermilk v. Best Pallet Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Loudermilk
Represented By: Jessica Judith Fayerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Pallet Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?