Makowski v. SmithAmundsen LLC et al

Plaintiff: Laura A. Makowski
Defendant: SmithAmundsen LLC, Glen E. Amundsen and Michael DeLargy
Case Number: 1:2008cv06912
Filed: December 3, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John W. Darrah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2012 289 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/21/2012.(mjc, )
May 9, 2012 258 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion before Honorable Sheila Finnegan: Plaintiff has filed a motion to compel documents withheld on claim of privilege. For the reasons set forth below, the motion is denied. [For further details see minute order.] Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (is, )
September 7, 2010 208 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 9/7/2010.(mjc, )
August 11, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion by the Honorable Sheila Finnegan on 8/11/2010: Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (is, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makowski v. SmithAmundsen LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura A. Makowski
Represented By: Tracey L. Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmithAmundsen LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen E. Amundsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael DeLargy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?