Zaborowski et al v. Sheriff of Cook County et al

Plaintiff: Catherine Zaborowski and Simone Jackson
Defendant: Sheriff of Cook County and Cook County, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2008cv06946
Filed: December 4, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 279 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/20/2011:Mailed notice(kef, )
January 26, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 1/26/2011: The Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiff's motion to compel 158 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
December 29, 2010 157 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/29/2010: The Court denies Defendant Dart's motion to dismiss 140 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
October 12, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/12/2010: The Court adopts Judge Valdez's Report and Recommendation 133 granting Defendants' motion for sanctions 82 . Plaintiffs must pay Defendants $740.00 in attorney's fees by no later than 11/9/10. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaborowski et al v. Sheriff of Cook County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Zaborowski
Represented By: Thomas Gerard Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Jackson
Represented By: Thomas Gerard Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Cook County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?