Blunt v. Becker et al

Plaintiff: Keith L. Blunt
Defendant: Kenneth Becker, R. Osborne, Brian Berka and Cheryl Dust
Case Number: 1:2008cv07157
Filed: December 15, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 5/2/2011. (lw, )
July 27, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE entry before Honorable Young B. Kim: Defendants' motion for protective order 61 is granted. Based on the arguments contained in defendants' motion and plaintiff's response thereto (docketed as Document 62 ), the court finds t hat the privacy interest subject to protection by the Illinois Juvenile Records Act outweighs any interest plaintiff has in the juvenile law enforcement records pertaining to Travontae Howard. In his response, plaintiff merely asserts without factual or legal basis that he is entitled to the records. Plaintiff also did not explain to the court how Howard's juvenile law enforcement records might be relevant or lead to information or evidence relevant to the prosecution of his Section 1983 ca se against various police officers. Defendants asserted that they forwarded a copy of Howard's juvenile law enforcement records (Exhibit B) for in camera review. The court did not receive a copy of Exhibit B and renders this decision without having reviewed Exhibit B. Mailed notice (aac, )
February 16, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/16/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blunt v. Becker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith L. Blunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Berka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Dust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?