Midwest Generation EME, LLC v. Continuum Chemical Corporation

Petitioner: Midwest Generation EME, LLC
Respondent: Continuum Chemical Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv07189
Filed: December 16, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/21/2010. Mailed notice(cdh, )
June 16, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/16/2010. Mailed notice(cdh, )
May 11, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 5/11/2009. Mailed and telephoned. (cdh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Generation EME, LLC v. Continuum Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Midwest Generation EME, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Continuum Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?