Sato & CO., LLC v. S & M Produce Inc et al

Plaintiff: Sato & CO., LLC
Defendant: S & M Produce Inc, Donald J Mided and Lance Mided
Case Number: 1:2008cv07352
Filed: December 23, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Agriculture Acts Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 275 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/19/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
September 17, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute entry by Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 9/17/2010: In its August 16, 2010 memorandum opinion and order 221 , the Court directed each of the claimants in this action to submit by September 1 a short document with its calculation of the inter est due in connection with the proposed entry of judgment against the corporate Defendant, S&M Produce, Inc. S&M was given until September 7 to lodge any objections to the claimants' proposed interest calculations. All but one claimant timely su bmitted the requested documentation, and no objections have been raised. Accordingly, the Court will incorporate into the preliminary claim chart the claimants interest calculations and enter judgment in favor of each claimant and against Defendant S &M Produce, Inc. in the amounts listed in the "Total Claim Allowed" column of the final claim chart appended to this order. This order disposes of all claims of all parties to this litigation against Defendant S&M Produce, Inc. and thus is a final judgment as to the claims against that Defendant. Because the Court further finds that there is no just reason to delay enforcement or appeal of this order, the Court enters judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). The Court also notes the filing of a stipulation for dismissal 224 by Intervening Plaintiffs Coosemans Chicago, Inc., JAB Produce, Inc., and Jack Tuchten Wholesale Produce, Inc. on the one hand and Defendant Donald J. Mided on the other hand. In view of that sti pulation of dismissal, all claims by those three Intervening Plaintiffs against Defendant Mided are dismissed with prejudice. All other claims against both individual Defendants, Donald Mided and Lance Mided, remain pending. The claims against Defendant Lance Mided are stayed in view of his bankruptcy filing [see 222]. This matter is set for further status on 10/15/2010 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice(tbk, )
August 16, 2010 221 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/16/2010:(gcy, )
February 2, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/2/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sato & CO., LLC v. S & M Produce Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sato & CO., LLC
Represented By: Michael Howard Erdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & M Produce Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J Mided
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Mided
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?