MSTG, Inc. v. Research in Motion Limited Featured Case

Plaintiff: MSTG, Inc.
Defendant: Research in Motion Limited
Case Number: 1:2008cv07411
Filed: December 30, 2008
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: David H. Coar
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2011 351 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 3/8/2011:Mailed notice(tlp, )
January 20, 2011 324 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 1/20/2011.Mailed notice(tlp, )
January 14, 2011 322 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 1/14/2011: Defendant Mobility LLC's unopposed motion 320 to withdraw the appearance of Laura L. Donoghue is granted. No court appearance is required on 1/18/2011. Status hearing set for 2/17/2011 at 8:30a.m. [For further detail see written opinion.] Mailed notice (ber, )
December 30, 2008 1
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff, MSTG, Inc.; Jury Demand: (Attachments: #(1) Ex. A (5,920,551 patent), #(2) Ex. B (US 6,219,374 B1 patent), and #(3) Ex. C (US 7,151,756 B1 patent)). Filing fee $350.00.(ar, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSTG, Inc. v. Research in Motion Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSTG, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond P. Niro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research in Motion Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?