Allen v. City of Chicago, Treasurer's Office

Plaintiff: Valerie Allen
Defendant: City of Chicago, Treasurer's Office
Case Number: 1:2009cv00243
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2013 212 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/10/2013.Mailed notice.(jlj)
February 4, 2013 191 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for judgment As A Matter of Law (Swabb, Timothy)
April 24, 2012 149 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE entry before Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown: Hearing held on objections to exhibits and witnesses. The rulings on the objections are set out below.All matters relating to the referral of this matter having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case returned to the assigned judge. [For further details see minute order.] Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 15, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/15/2011: Mailed notice (gds, )
January 8, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Michael T. Mason on 1/8/2010.(rbf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. City of Chicago, Treasurer's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Allen
Represented By: Cynthia M. Rote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago, Treasurer's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?