Woods v. Wickes Furniture Co., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Shirley B. Woods
Defendant: Wickes Furniture Co., Inc., John Disa, Forsyth Suzanne, Rackel Roger and Ken Bvetuiscu
Case Number: 1:2009cv00300
Filed: January 16, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Lake
Referring Judge: Geraldine Soat Brown
Presiding Judge: Blanche M. Manning
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 7/28/2011. (aac, )
April 7, 2011 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 4/7/2011. (aac, )
November 10, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE entry before Honorable Young B. Kim: On October 22, 2010, Plaintiff filed the following motions: (1) motion to initiate discovery 86 ; (2) motion to exclude witnesses from the courtroom 87 ; (3) motion to disqualify opposing counsel 88 ; (4 ) motion to add opposing counsel as a party defendant 89 ; and (5) motion for summary judgment 90 . Then on November 1, 2010, Plaintiff noticed the five motions previously filed for December 14, 2010. This notice was docketed as a separate motion [ 91]. For the reasons contained herein motions 86 and 90 are denied without prejudice, motion 87 is granted and motions 88 and 89 are denied. To the extent that Plaintiff's notice has been docketed as a separate motion, motion 91 is d enied as moot. Plaintiff is reminded that her response to Defendants' motion to enforce settlement agreement is due on or before November 19, 2010. Parties need not appear in court on December 14, 2010. The status hearing scheduled for December 14, 2010, is stricken. The court will set a new status hearing after ruling on Defendants' motion to enforce the settlement agreement. A copy of this order is mailed to Plaintiff Woods at P.O. Box 1025, North Chicago, IL 60064. [ For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(aac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Wickes Furniture Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley B. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wickes Furniture Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Disa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forsyth Suzanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rackel Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Bvetuiscu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?