Smentek v. Sheriff of Cook County et al

Plaintiff: John Smentek
Defendant: Sheriff of Cook County and Cook County, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2009cv00529
Filed: January 27, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2016 473 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 10/13/2016: Plaintiffs' amended motion to divide the class into subclasses (dkt. 430) is denied. Plaintiffs' motion to divide the class into subclasses (dkt. 398) is moot. Plain tiffs' motion to allow limited discovery (dkt. 465) is denied. Plaintiffs' counsel, in cooperation with defendant's counsel, shall prepare a proposed class notice consistent with Rule 23(c)(2)(B) which shall be filed not later than November 3, 2016. The case will be called for status hearing on October 18, 2016 at 10:30 a.m., at which lead counsel for each party shall appear and be prepared to discuss the resolution of this case.Mailed notice(mad, )
December 22, 2014 390 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 12/22/2014: Defendants' motion to decertify 306 is granted in part and denied in part. The court decertifies the (b)(2) class and will modify the (b)(3) class definition in a man ner to be determined. Plaintiffs' motion for a permanent injunction 236 is denied as moot, as is defendants' motion to strike portions of plaintiffs' proposed findings of fact 343 . The parties are directed to confer in an effort to reach agreement on a closing date for the class period and to discuss parameters for possible settlement on the entire case. Status hearing is set for 1/20/2015 at 10;30 a.m.Mailed notice(mad, )
April 30, 2014 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Entered by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 4/30/2014: For the reasons set out in the attached order, Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Reopen Discovery to Allow Depositions of Witnesses Disclosed by Defendants After the Close of Fact Discovery 280 is denied. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff.(psm, )
April 8, 2014 291 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 4/8/2014.(psm, )
March 25, 2014 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 3/25/2014: Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Compel 228 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: The Sheriff shall provide to plaintiffs' counsel statistics showing the monthly a nd yearly detainee population of Cook County Department of Corrections in 2011, 2012 and 2013, and the average and median length of detainment at the Cook County Department of Corrections in 2011 and 2012. In all other respects, the motion is denied. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, )
December 19, 2013 233 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 12/19/2013.(psm, )
June 11, 2013 157 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 6/11/2013.(psm, )
November 18, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 11/18/2010:Mailed notice(mad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smentek v. Sheriff of Cook County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Smentek
Represented By: Thomas Gerard Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff of Cook County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?