United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Benger et al

Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Stefan H. Benger, SHB Capital, Inc., Jason B Meyers, International Capital Financial Resources, LLC, Philip T Powers, Handler, Thayer & Duggan, LLC, Frank I Reinschreiber and Global Financial Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00676
Filed: February 3, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: Cook
Referring Judge: Jeffrey Cole
Presiding Judge: Joan H. Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 15:77 Securities Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2016 564 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 2/10/2016.(rbf, )
November 9, 2015 557 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 11/9/2015:Mailed notice(jms, )
August 13, 2014 530 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 8/13/2014. Mailed notice(cdh, )
May 27, 2014 507 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 5/27/2014:Mailed notice(jms, )
April 9, 2014 483 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 4/9/2014:Mailed notice(jms, )
January 29, 2014 462 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission for judgment Against Defendants Frank I. Reinschreiber and Global Financial Management, LLC (Polish, Jonathan)
March 28, 2013 415 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 3/28/2013. (ma,)
March 21, 2013 413 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. The defendants motion to dismiss 349 is DENIED. Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 3/21/13. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 15, 2013 405 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 2/15/2013:Mailed notice(jms, )
March 10, 2010 232 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 3/10/2010:Mailed notice(mad, )
June 29, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 6/29/2009:Mailed notice(mad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Benger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: John J. Sikora, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefan H. Benger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHB Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason B Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Capital Financial Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip T Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handler, Thayer & Duggan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank I Reinschreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Financial Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?