Coleman v. Cook County

Case Number: 1:2009cv00739
Filed: February 5, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment Office
Presiding Judge: David H. Coar
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Cook County for judgment pursuant to Rule 50 (Sebastian, Julie Ann)
October 20, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 10/20/2010:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 25, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable David H. Coar on 2/25/2010:Mailed notice(pm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Cook County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?