Pierce v. City of Chicago Illinois et al

Plaintiff: Marvin Pierce
Defendant: City of Chicago Illinois and Officer Stuckert
Case Number: 1:2009cv01462
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 2/7/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
June 14, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/14/2011: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff Marvin Pierces second motion for leave to file a first amended complaint 55 . For the reasons stated below, the Court denies Plaintiffs motion. This case is set for further status hearing on 7/5/2011 at 9:00 a.m. Notices Mailed by Judge's staff (tbk, )
November 8, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court Before the Court is Plaintiff Marvin Pierces motion for leave to file a first amended complaint 44 , filed on July 6, 2010. For the reasons below, the Court denies Plaintiffs motion. Enter WRITTEN OPINION: Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 11/8/2010. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. City of Chicago Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Pierce
Represented By: Jeffrey Brooks Granich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stuckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?