Colida v. Panasonic Corporation of North America

Plaintiff: Tony Colida
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Case Number: 1:2009cv01786
Filed: March 23, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1126 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/24/2011: Mailed notice (hp, )
September 20, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/20/2010: For the reasons stated below, the Court vacates its earlier order directing plaintiff to show cause why the case should not be dismissed based on claim preclusion. The Court de nies defendants' motion for sanctions # 46 as premature and denies plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel # 44 as described below. All discovery is to be completed by 1/31/11. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is 2/21/11 , though any party may file a dispositive motion earlier than that if it believes that to be appropriate. The case is set for a status hearing in open court on 2/24/11 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff and counsel for defendants are directed to appear in person at that time. [ For further details see Order.] Mailed notice(hp, )
July 21, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/21/2010: Mailed notice(hp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colida v. Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Colida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?