Trustees of The Automobile Mechanics' Industry Welfare and Pension Funds Local 701 v. Elmhurst Lincoln Mercury, Inc.

Plaintiff: Trustees of The Automobile Mechanics' Industry Welfare and Pension Funds Local 701
Defendant: Elmhurst Lincoln Mercury, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01856
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2011 122 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER OF JUDGMENT AS TO INTERVENOR ACTION Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 5/27/2011:Mailed notice(mpj, )
September 29, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/29/2010:Mailed notice(mpj, )
January 7, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/7/2010:Mailed notice(mpj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of The Automobile Mechanics' Industry Welfare and Pension Funds Local 701 v. Elmhurst Lincoln Mercury, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of The Automobile Mechanics' Industry Welfare and Pension Funds Local 701
Represented By: L. Steven Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmhurst Lincoln Mercury, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?