Jacobeit v. Rich Township High School District 227 et al

Plaintiff: Fred R. Jacobeit
Defendant: Rich Township High School District 227 and Maceo M. Rainey
Case Number: 1:2009cv01924
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James F. Holderman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2012 235 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 3/28/2012.Mailed notice.(jlj)
May 25, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Michael T. Mason on 5/25/11.(rbf, )
November 25, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 11/25/2009: Mailed notice (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobeit v. Rich Township High School District 227 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred R. Jacobeit
Represented By: Laurie Marie Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Township High School District 227
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maceo M. Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?