Prince v. Chicago Public Schools et al

Plaintiff: Earl Kelly Prince
Defendant: Chicago Public Schools and Chicago Board of Education
Case Number: 1:2009cv02010
Filed: April 1, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Insurance Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Referring Judge: Michael T. Mason
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 206 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 7/3/2012:Following entry of judgment in its favor, Defendant submitted a bill of costs 179 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d). The Court took the bill of costs under advi sement and gave Plaintiff time to object. After receiving several extensions of time to respond, Plaintiff filed his response. For the reasons stated below, the Court grants in part Defendants request for costs 179 and awards Defendant $1,872.24 in costs. Mailed notice (For further details see Written Opinion)(nf, )
March 14, 2012 204 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/14/2012: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal 202 is respectfully denied. The Clerk is directed to notify the part ies and the Court of Appeals of this order (see Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(4)(A)) and Plaintiff is advised that he may either pay the filing fee or file in the Court of Appeals a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (see Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5). Mailed notice(nf, )
December 12, 2011 178 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/12/2011: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiffs Rule 59(e) motion to alter or amend judgment 167 is respectfully denied. Mailed notice(tbk, )
August 25, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/25/2011. Notices Mailed by Judge's Staff (tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Chicago Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Kelly Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?