Arriaga et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al

Case Number: 1:2009cv02115
Filed: April 6, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Truth in Lending Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Norgle
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 217 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 3/27/2013. (mgh, )
September 27, 2012 207 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 9/27/2012:Plaintiffs' Motion for clarification, Amendment, or Reconsideration of Order 129 is denied. Plaintiffs' Motion for extension of time 137 is denied as moot. (For further detail see written opinion).Mailed notice(smm)
February 2, 2012 149 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 2/2/2012: Plaintiff's motion for court supervision of Deposition of Pro Se Plaintiffs and for protective order 144 is denied. Mailed notice(vcf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arriaga et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?