Zimnicki v. General Foam Plastics Corp.

Plaintiff: Sandra K. Zimnicki
Defendant: General Foam Plastics Corp.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02132
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: John F. Grady
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2011 273 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 11/22/2011. Mailed notice(cdh, )
March 3, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Martin C. Ashman on 3/3/2011:Mailed notice(tlp, )
October 4, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 10/4/2010.(mjc, )
March 24, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable John F. Grady on 3/24/2010.(mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimnicki v. General Foam Plastics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra K. Zimnicki
Represented By: Jeffrey A Wakolbinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Foam Plastics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?