Illinois Bell Telephone Company, Inc. v. Global NAPs Illinois, Inc.

Plaintiff: Illinois Bell Telephone Company, Inc.
Defendant: Global NAPs Illinois, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv02189
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P. Kocoras
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/21/2010. Mailed notice (tlm)
February 18, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 2/18/2010.(ea, )
August 31, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/31/2009.(ef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Illinois Bell Telephone Company, Inc. v. Global NAPs Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Bell Telephone Company, Inc.
Represented By: Hans J. Germann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global NAPs Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?