Anderson et al v. City of Chicago, Illinois et al

Plaintiff: Marlin Anderson, Marilyn Anderson, Markita Anderson, Latoya Curry and Christopher Monroe
Defendant: City of Chicago, Illinois, C Thurman, Janik and Two Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2009cv02311
Filed: April 16, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/9/2011: The Court denies Plaintiffs' motion for a new trial pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 127 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
November 30, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/30/2010: The Court grants in part, denies in part, and denies in part without prejudice Plaintiffs' motion in limine #3 65 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
November 19, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/19/2010: The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion in limine #1 65 without prejudice. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
November 2, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/2/2010: The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion in limine #1 75 . [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice(kef, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. City of Chicago, Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlin Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Brooks Granich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Brooks Granich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markita Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey Brooks Granich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Curry
Represented By: Jeffrey Brooks Granich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Monroe
Represented By: Jeffrey Brooks Granich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Thurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?