Hansen v. Centimark Corporation

Plaintiff: Patrick Hansen
Defendant: Centimark Corporation
Case Number: 1:2009cv02336
Filed: April 16, 2009
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R. Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the USDC for the Nothern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2009.]
March 20, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting substitution. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/19/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2009.]
February 25, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court (correct order) amending stay ORDER (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2009.]
October 28, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying proceedings. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/27/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008) [Transferred from California Northern on 4/17/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen v. Centimark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Hansen
Represented By: Steven B. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centimark Corporation
Represented By: Clinton Judd McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?